Lucas v. Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Thersa Lucas
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2018cv03399
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Referring Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 IT IS ORDERED the Scheduling Conference presently set for 1/11/19 at 1:30 p.m. is RESET AS TO TIME ONLY!! Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/19 at 11:15 a.m. in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G. Murray Snow. Ordered by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow. (GMS, ag) ( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #14 Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated. (Kelley, Michael)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #11 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Thersa Lucas. (Victor, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated. (Kelley, Michael)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/31/18. (DXD)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated. (Kelley, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - This case is reassigned to Chief Judge G Murray Snow for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall bear the following case caption: CV 18-03399-PHX-GMS. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/22/18. (DXD)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated. (Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet) not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated. (MCO)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16101697. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-03399-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
October 22, 2018 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED: ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated. ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES***(MCO)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-051866. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16101697 filed by Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated. (Kelley, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas v. Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Gary Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thersa Lucas
Represented By: Jeffrey Lloyd Victor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?