Reilly v. Levy et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly
Defendant: Charles Albert Levy, IV, Mission Music LLC, Folsom Projects LLC and Stateside Presents Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2018cv03405
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Remark: as to out of state attorneys Aaron Davidson and Brian L King, attorneys removed for noncompliance with admission procedures; party and/or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: This case is reassigned to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-18-3405-PHX-SMB. Any deadlines and/or hearings are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 4(m) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on January 21, 2019. (See document for further details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/6/18. (LAD)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G. Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-3405-PHX-GMS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly. (Limon-Wynn, Monica)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Folsom Projects LLC, Charles Albert Levy, IV, Mission Music LLC, Stateside Presents Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 A0 120 and 121)(MCO)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16105207. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-03405-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly. (Limon-Wynn, Monica) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MCO)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16105207 filed by Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly. (Limon-Wynn, Monica) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reilly v. Levy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Albert Levy, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Music LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Folsom Projects LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stateside Presents Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly
Represented By: Monica Anne Limon-Wynn
Represented By: Aaron Davidson
Represented By: Brian L King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?