Rapp v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Margaret Rapp
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2018cv03460
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Referring Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Meyer, Cassandra)
November 29, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #14 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by Margaret Rapp. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
November 29, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Margaret Rapp. (Maerowitz, Matthew)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER resetting the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 12/17/2018 to 1/24/2019 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/9/2018. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J. Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-3460-PHX-DJH. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set before Judge Deborah M. Fine on 12/17/18 at 1:30 PM is now RESET before Judge Diane J. Humetewa, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM in Special Proceedings Courtroom, 2nd Floor, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 10/31/18. (MSA)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Meyer, Cassandra)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1.1 - Disclosure statement must be made on a form provided by the clerk.. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16116294. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-3460-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (MFR)
October 24, 2018 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Costco Wholesale Corporation on 10/4/2018 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 10/5/2018). (MFR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Meyer, Cassandra) (MFR)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-011522. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16116294 filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Meyer, Cassandra) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-G, #4 Notice to Plaintiff)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rapp v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Represented By: Karen Christine Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Rapp
Represented By: Howard Rudolph Gaines
Represented By: Matthew James Maerowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?