Xcentric Ventures LLC v. Epifaniou et al

Plaintiff: Xcentric Ventures LLC
Defendant: Pierre Zarokian, Joshua Polloso Epifaniou and Unknown Zarokian
Case Number: 2:2018cv03661
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Price, Charles)
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Xcentric Ventures LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint, Summons, and MIDP Order upon Pierre Zarokian on 12/12/18. (Price, Charles)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for January 7, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order that Xcentric Ventures LLC show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/7/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Pierre Zarokian. (SST). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Price, Charles)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Price, Charles)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO121)(SIB)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SIB)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16143989. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-3661-PHX-JZB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SIB)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Price, Charles) (SIB)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16143989 filed by Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Price, Charles) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SIB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xcentric Ventures LLC v. Epifaniou et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierre Zarokian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Polloso Epifaniou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Zarokian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xcentric Ventures LLC
Represented By: Charles Steven Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?