Reilly v. Wozniak et al

Plaintiff: Ralph T Reilly
Defendant: Wozu Education Holdings LLC, Southern Careers Institute Incorporated, Steve Wozniak and Woz U Education LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv03775
Filed: November 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Woz U Education LLC, Wozu Education Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schern, Michael)
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ralph T Reilly: Declaration of Service re: 2 COPIES OF THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS: CIVIL SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FOR 1. IMPLIED IN FACT 2. MONEY HAD AND RECEIVED 3. COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF 5. ACCOUNTING; ORDER DOC(8); ORDER (DOC 9); NOTICE TO PARTIES - MANDATORY INITIAL DISCOVERY PILOT PROJECT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; CIVIL COVER SHEET. $25.00 CHECK MADE PAYABLE TO THE ARIZONA CORPORATION COMMISSION upon WOZ U Education LLC through the Arizona Corp. Commission on 12/13/2018. (Markovich, Raymond)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ralph T Reilly: Declaration of Service re: CIVIL SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FOR 1. IMPLIED IN FACT 2. MONEY HAD AND RECEIVED 3. COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF 5. ACCOUNTING; ORDER DOC(8); ORDER (DOC 9); NOTICE TO PARTIES - MANDATORY INITIAL DISCOVERY PILOT PROJECT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; CIVIL COVER SHEET upon WOZU Education Holdings, LLC on 11/28/2018. (Markovich, Raymond)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ralph T Reilly: Affidavit of Service re: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT FOR: 1. IMPLIED IN FACT CONTRACT 2. MONEY HAD AND RECEIVED 3. COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (17 U.S.C. 501) 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF 5. ACCOUNTING DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE TO PARTIES -MANDATORY INITIAL DISCOVERY, ORDER, ORDER, NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO EXERCISE JURISDICTION upon Southern Career Institute, Inc. on 12/12/2018. (Markovich, Raymond)
November 12, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Ralph T Reilly. (Markovich, Raymond)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on February 4, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/7/18. (JAMA)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/7/18. (JAMA)
November 6, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Raymond James Markovich on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Ralph T Reilly. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Southern Careers Institute Incorporated, Woz U Education LLC, Steve Wozniak, Wozu Education Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Woz U Education, #2 Summons Wozu Education Holdings, #3 Summons Southern Careers Institute)(BAR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(BAR)
November 3, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16156694. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-03775-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
November 3, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Ralph T Reilly. (Markovich, Raymond) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAR)
November 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16156694 filed by Ralph T Reilly. (Markovich, Raymond) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Pro Hac Vice Receipt)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reilly v. Wozniak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wozu Education Holdings LLC
Represented By: Michael A Schern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Careers Institute Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woz U Education LLC
Represented By: Michael A Schern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph T Reilly
Represented By: Raymond James Markovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?