Isip et al v. World Financial Group

Plaintiff: Faye Perez and Erlinda Isip
Defendant: World Financial Group
Case Number: 2:2018cv04182
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Erlinda Isip: PO Box 51175, Phoenix, AZ 85076. (RMV)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 * MOTION to Dismiss Case (As Claims are Barred) by World Financial Group. (True, Nicole). * Added MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; attorney noticed on 1/18/2019 (RMV).
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. World Financial Group answer due 1/17/2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 12/20/2018. (TCA)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by World Financial Group identifying Corporate Parent AUSA Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent AEGON N.V., Corporate Parent Transamerica Corporation for World Financial Group. (True, Nicole)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by World Financial Group. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(True, Nicole)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: This case is reassigned to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-18-4182-PHX-SMB. Any deadlines and/or hearings are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE re: Service of Order re: #5 Order by Erlinda Isip. (DXD)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Errata Exhibits re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Erlinda Isip, Faye Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-25, #2 Exhibit 26)(DXD)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Before the filing of any motion under Rule 12(b)(6) or 12(c), the parties must confer in good faith to determine whether the motion can be avoided. Any motion under Rule 12(b)(6) or 12(c) must certify that the parties conferred in good faith but were unable to agree that the complaint is curable by a permissible amendment. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file notice of service with the Court. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/26/18. (DXD)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (SST)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SST)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX202755. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-04182-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SST)
November 21, 2018 Summons Issued at customer service intake counter as to World Financial Group. (SST) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX202755 filed by Erlinda Isip, Faye Perez.(SST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isip et al v. World Financial Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erlinda Isip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Financial Group
Represented By: Edwin Allen Barkel
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Represented By: Nicole Marie True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?