Ohlinger et al v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Debra L Ohlinger and Gregory K Ohlinger
Defendant: United States of America and Maricopoly LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv04185
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #13 Motion to Stay. ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/12/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the stay automatically lifts upon restoration of government funding to the Department; and within 14 days of restoration of government funding, the parties shall file a joint status report regarding effect of the stay on all pending case deadlines. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/15/2019. (LFIG)
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Maricopoly LLC.(Lynde, Lawrence)
January 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Matter in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramirez, Edith)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Debra L Ohlinger, Gregory K Ohlinger: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 01/02/2019 to Maricopoly, LLC . (Keim, Brandon)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Certificate of Service of Order Settng Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Debra L Ohlinger, Gregory K Ohlinger. (Keim, Brandon)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 2/12/2019 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order upon Defendants and file notice of service. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/28/2018. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Debra L Ohlinger, Gregory K Ohlinger: Certificate of Service re: Court Order re FRCP 12(b) motions upon United State of America and Maricopoly on 11/27/2018. (Keim, Brandon)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Debra L Ohlinger, Gregory K Ohlinger: Certificate of Service re: Certificate of Service Via Certified Mail/Return Receipt Requested upon United State of America and Maricopoly on 11/26/2018. (Keim, Brandon)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/26/2018. (LFIG)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Gregory K Ohlinger, Debra L Ohlinger. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Maricopoly LLC, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MFR)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16225555. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-4185-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Debra L Ohlinger, Gregory K Ohlinger. (Keim, Brandon) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MFR)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16225555 filed by Gregory K Ohlinger, Debra L Ohlinger. (Keim, Brandon) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohlinger et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Edith Carmen Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopoly LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Keith Lynde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra L Ohlinger
Represented By: Yale F Goldberg
Represented By: Brandon Anthony Keim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory K Ohlinger
Represented By: Yale F Goldberg
Represented By: Brandon Anthony Keim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?