Tedards et al v. Ducey et al
Plaintiff: William Price Tedards, Jr., Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, Ross Trumble and Monica Wnuk
Defendant: Jon Kyl, Doug Ducey and Martha McSally
Case Number: 2:2018cv04241
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 79 MANDATE of USCA (19-16308) affirming the decision of the district court re: #71 Notice of Appeal filed by Barry Hess, Monica Wnuk, William Price Tedards, Jr., Lawrence Lilien, Ross Trumble. (Attachments: #1 Opinion)(LAD)
July 29, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Michael T Liburdi. (Liburdi, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Filing 76 MANDATE of USCA Dismissing Appeal upon Motion re: 19-16237 as to #68 Notice of Appeal filed by Barry Hess, Monica Wnuk, William Price Tedards, Jr., Lawrence Lilien, Ross Trumble. (DXD)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting the #73 Stipulation and extending the deadline for any party to file their (1) Bill of Costs; and (2) Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses, to 90 days from the date of final resolution of all appellate proceedings related to and including Plaintiffs' appeal filed on July 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/9/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
July 9, 2019 Filing 73 STIPULATION Joint Stipulaiton to Extend Time to File (1) Bill of costs; and (2) motion for award of attorneys' fees and related non-taxable expenses by Doug Ducey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Liburdi, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 72 USCA Case Number re: #71 Notice of Appeal. Case number 19-16308, Ninth Circuit. (GMP)
July 1, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #70 Clerks Judgment, #69 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-17110253. (Geoghegan, Thomas)
June 27, 2019 Filing 70 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed June 27, 2019, judgment of dismissal is entered and this action is hereby terminated. (LFIG)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER that Defendants' #21 Motion to Dismiss is granted. Counts One and Two are dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Count Three is dismissed because Plaintiffs lack standing to assert the claim. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #14 Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction is denied. Plaintiffs' #16 Motion to Consolidate a hearing on the Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction with Trial on the Merits is denied as moot. Plaintiffs' #65 Motion for Status Conference is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk of Court shall kindly enter judgment and terminate this action. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/27/2019.(See Order for details.) (LFIG)
June 20, 2019 Filing 75 USCA Case Number re: #68 Notice of Appeal. Case number 19-16237, Ninth Circuit. (DXD)
June 20, 2019 Filing 68 *NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-17070241. (Persoon, Michael) *Modified to correct linkage per attorney's request on 6/20/2019 (EJA).
June 14, 2019 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk for proceedings held on 4/12/2019, Judge Diane J Humetewa hearing judge(s). (Geoghegan, Thomas)
June 13, 2019 Filing 66 RESPONSE to Motion re: #65 MOTION for Status Conference filed by Doug Ducey. (Draye, Dominic)
June 11, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Status Conference by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Persoon, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a two page letter from Plaintiffs' counsel, Mr. Persoon, dated June 7, 2019. This letter is not styled as a motion or a notice and is written on counsel's law firm's letterhead. Moreover, the letter was not filed on the docket, but rather sent to chambers at the Court's public mailing address. The Court will not consider the arguments or requests made therein, nor will it consider any request that is not properly filed pursuant to applicable Federal and Local Rules. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED the Court will not take any action on the written correspondence. If action is required, counsel shall file an appropriate motion or notice. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/11/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
April 19, 2019 Filing 62 *Joinder/OPENING BRIEF re: #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (and Supporting Memorandum) and #22 Response to Motion re: #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Permanent Injunction) by Martha McSally. (Jacobs, Ronald) *Modified event/text and added document links on 4/22/2019 (REK).
April 17, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING Proceedings held on 04/12/2019, before Judge DIANE J. HUMETEWA. [Court Reporter Linda Schroeder, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7249]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2019. (RCO)
April 15, 2019 Filing 60 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Doug Ducey for proceedings held on April 12, 2019, Judge Diane J Humetewa hearing judge(s). (Johnson, Brett)
April 12, 2019 Filing 59 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Diane J Humetewa: This is the time set for Oral Argument held on 4/12/2019 re: Plaintiffs' #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction, and Defendants' #21 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED granting Senator McSally's #55 Motion for Leave to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. The Court notes she has joined the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Argument heard as to the pending motions. IT IS ORDERED taking this matter under advisement. Counsel for Senator McSally is permitted to file an optional five (5) page brief within seven (7) days. APPEARANCES: Michael Persoon for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by Michael Kielsky for Plaintiffs. Michael Liburdi, Anni Foster, Colin Ahler and Brett Johnson for Defendants. Telephonic appearance by Ronald Jacobs for Senator McSally. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.) Hearing held 2:00 PM to 3:12 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting the #56 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. ORDERED that counsel will receive dial-in instructions for the teleconference via electronic mail. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/12/2019. (LFIG)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: A hearing having been set in this case for April 12, 2019, the Court hereby denies the #30 Motion for Expedited Rule 16 Conference as moot. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/11/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
April 11, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Hearing by Martha McSally. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order To Appear Telephonically)(Jacobs, Ronald)
April 10, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Complaint by Martha McSally. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave, #2 Exhibit Joinder if Motion for Leave is Granted)(Jacobs, Ronald)
April 10, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Michael Jacobs on behalf of Martha McSally. (Jacobs, Ronald)
April 10, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion for Ronald M Jacobs on behalf of Martha McSally. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 9, 2019 Filing 53 *Document filed in the incorrect case. All docket text associated with the entry has been removed on 4/9/2019 (SCH).
April 5, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Andrew Sniegowski filed by Brett William Johnson. (Johnson, Brett)
April 4, 2019 Filing 51 REQUEST re: For Judicial Notice and Supporting Memorandum by Defendant Doug Ducey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit F-K, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Liburdi, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' #48 Motion for Clarification on Scope of Hearing. The Court will hear argument on the Plaintiffs' #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction concurrent with the previously scheduled oral argument on Defendant's #21 Motion to Dismiss on April 12, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. The Order Setting Oral Argument #45 remains otherwise in full effect. No additional time will be allowed. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/21/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
March 13, 2019 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #48 MOTION Clarification on Scope of Hearing and Request for Hearing on Preliminary and Permanent Injunction filed by Doug Ducey. (Liburdi, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION Clarification on Scope of Hearing and Request for Hearing on Preliminary and Permanent Injunction by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Persoon, Michael)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED approving the Amended Notice of Withdrawal (Doc. #46 ). Attorney Daniel B. Seiden is relieved of any further representation of Defendant Doug Ducey in this case. The Clerk of the Court is kindly instructed to terminate Daniel B. Seiden as counsel of record. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/5/19. (LAD)
March 4, 2019 Filing 46 ** CONSTRUED as an Amended Notice of Withdrawal pursuant to #47 Order ** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Of Danile B. Seiden As Counsel Of Record for Defendent Doug Ducey With Client Consent by Doug Ducey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Porposed Order)(Liburdi, Michael) Modified on 3/5/2019 (LAD).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER setting Oral Argument re: Defendants' #21 Motion to Dismiss for 4/12/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Each side will be permitted 30 minutes to address the Court. The parties shall be ready to present any necessary witnesses or exhibits. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/20/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
February 20, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE re: Of Withdrawal As Counsel of Defendant Doug Ducey by Doug Ducey . (Liburdi, Michael) Please Note: Incorrect event utilized and document not in compliance with Local Rule 83.3. Attorney notified to file a motion on 2/21/2019. (REK).
February 7, 2019 Filing 43 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Defendant Doug Ducey. Please Note: Document Number #42 submitted with the incorrect event. Item re-docketed with the correct event for statistical and case management purposes. (REK)
February 7, 2019 Filing 42 *Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) by Defendant Doug Ducey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liburdi, Michael) *Modified to correct event and text. Item re-docketed at 43 for statistical and case management purposes on 2/8/2019 (REK).
February 7, 2019 Filing 41 *NOTICE re: Service upon McSally filed by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk of Docket Entries #1, #13-16, #20-22 . (Persoon, Michael) *Modified to correct event on 2/8/2019 (REK).
February 7, 2019 Filing 40 *NOTICE/Certificate of Service upon the Attorney General of the State of Arizona filed by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk: Certificate of Service re: Amended Complaint (Dkt. #13 ), Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #14 ), Memorandum of Law in Support of Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #15 ), and Motion to Consolidate under Rule 16 (Dkt. #16 ) upon Attorney General of the State of Arizona on 2/7/2019. (Persoon, Michael) *Modified to correct event and text on 2/8/2019 (REK).
February 7, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal of Michael A. Schorsch filed by Michael A Schorsch. (Schorsch, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Doug Ducey. (Johnson, Brett)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER the parties shall meet and confer and Plaintiffs shall submit a joint proposed scheduling report to the Court no later than February 8, 2019, as to the information set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/31/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
January 25, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #35 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Barry Hess, Monica Wnuk, William Price Tedards, Jr., Lawrence Lilien, Ross Trumble. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Thomas Geoghegan but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Michael Schorsch. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
January 25, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Schorsch, Michael)
January 24, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #30 MOTION for Expedited Rule 16 Conference filed by Doug Ducey. (Liburdi, Michael)
January 24, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Michael Schorsch, Michael Persoon and Thomas Geoghegan on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 18, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl. of Barry Hess)(Schorsch, Michael)
January 18, 2019 Filing 32 *REPLY to Response to Motion re: #16 MOTION to Consolidate with a Trial on the Merits under Rule 65(a)(2) filed by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Persoon, Michael) *Modified to correct document link on 1/18/2019 (REK).
January 17, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re: #30 MOTION for Expedited Rule 16 Conference filed by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Persoon, Michael)
January 16, 2019 Filing 30 *MOTION for Expedited Rule 16 Conference by Doug Ducey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Liburdi, Michael) *Modified to correct motion type on 1/17/2019 (REK).
January 16, 2019 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to Martha McSally, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
January 16, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Submitted by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Geoghegan, Thomas)
January 16, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #24 Summons Submitted filed by Barry Hess, Monica Wnuk, William Price Tedards, Jr., Lawrence Lilien, Ross Trumble, #23 Summons Submitted filed by Barry Hess, Monica Wnuk, William Price Tedards, Jr., Lawrence Lilien, Ross Trumble. Summons are missing attorney information on bottom of form. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Having considered Plaintiffs' #25 Motion for Leave to File a Consolidated Memorandum in Response and Reply, the Court finds it would be helpful to have specific responses and replies filed as it relates to each motion. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED the #25 Motion is denied. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/15/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
January 15, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File a Consolidated Memorandum In Response And Reply by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Geoghegan, Thomas)
January 15, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Submitted by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Geoghegan, Thomas)
January 15, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Submitted by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Geoghegan, Thomas)
January 11, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re: #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Doug Ducey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Johnson, Brett)
January 11, 2019 Filing 21 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim(and Supporting Memorandum) by Doug Ducey. (Liburdi, Michael) *Modified to correct motion type on 1/14/2019 (REK).
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #16 MOTION To consolidate with a trial on the merits under Rule 65(a)(2) re: #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Memorandum in Support, #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Doug Ducey. (Liburdi, Michael)
January 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE re: of Substitution by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk . (Geoghegan, Thomas)
January 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #17 Summons Submitted filed by Barry Hess, Monica Wnuk, William Price Tedards, Jr., Lawrence Lilien, Ross Trumble. Party listed on summons not on complaint. Unable to issue summons. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Submitted by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Geoghegan, Thomas)
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION To consolidate with a trial on the merits under Rule 65(a)(2) re: #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Memorandum in Support, #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schorsch, Michael)
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 *MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Permanent Injunction by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Schorsch, Michael) *Modified to correct event on 1/2/2019 (REK).
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 *MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schorsch, Michael). *Added MOTION for Permanent Injunction on 1/2/2019 (REK).
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by William Price Tedards, Jr, Lawrence Lilien, Barry Hess, Monica Wnuk, Ross Trumble.(Geoghegan, Thomas)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting the #11 Motion and giving Plaintiffs up to and including December 21, 2018, to file an amended complaint. ORDERED that Defendants will have up to and including January 11, 2019, to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunctionor in the Alternative for a Permanent Injunction Pursuant to Rule 65(a)(2) is denied without prejudice. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Oral Argument is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/14/2018. (LFIG)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 *MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, MOTION to Withdraw: #2 Motion for Injunction by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Persoon, Michael) *Added MOTION to Withdraw on 12/13/2018 along with document links. (REK).
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Doug Ducey. (Liburdi, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Liburdi on behalf of Doug Ducey. (Liburdi, Michael)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 *MOTION for Hearing (Oral Argument) re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record)(Geoghegan, Thomas) *Modified to correct motion type on 12/6/2018 (REK).
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk: Declaration of Service re: Order, Complain, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, Notice, Consent, and Order of Reference, Notice to Parties- MIDP upon Doug Ducey, Governor of Arizona on 11/30/2018. (Persoon, Michael)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/29/2018. (LFIG)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16243355. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-04241-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Kielsky, Michael) (BAR)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or in the Alternative for a Permanent Injunction Pursuant to Rule 65(a)(2) by Barry Hess, Lawrence Lilien, William Price Tedards, Jr, Ross Trumble, Monica Wnuk. (Kielsky, Michael) (BAR)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16243355 filed by William Price Tedards, Jr, Lawrence Lilien, Barry Hess, Monica Wnuk, Ross Trumble. (Kielsky, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAR)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16243355 filed by William Price Tedards, Jr, Lawrence Lilien, Barry Hess, Monica Wnuk, Ross Trumble. (Kielsky, Michael) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tedards et al v. Ducey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Kyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Ducey
Represented By: Andrew Michael Sniegowski
Represented By: Colin Patrick Ahler
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Anni Lori Foster
Represented By: Daniel Blake Seiden
Represented By: Michael T Liburdi
Represented By: Dominic Emil Draye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha McSally
Represented By: Ronald Michael Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Price Tedards, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas H Geoghegan
Represented By: Michael Kielsky
Represented By: Michael P Persoon
Represented By: Michael A Schorsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Hess
Represented By: Thomas H Geoghegan
Represented By: Michael Kielsky
Represented By: Michael P Persoon
Represented By: Michael A Schorsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Lilien
Represented By: Thomas H Geoghegan
Represented By: Michael Kielsky
Represented By: Michael P Persoon
Represented By: Michael A Schorsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Trumble
Represented By: Thomas H Geoghegan
Represented By: Michael Kielsky
Represented By: Michael P Persoon
Represented By: Michael A Schorsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Wnuk
Represented By: Thomas H Geoghegan
Represented By: Michael Kielsky
Represented By: Michael P Persoon
Represented By: Michael A Schorsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?