Sharp v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: David Lee Sharp
Defendant: T Williams, Unknow Party, Unknown Garcia and Unknown Ralenkotter
Case Number: 2:2018cv04362
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett (PS)
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDMENT STATEMENT re: #6 Notice/Letter by Plaintiff David Lee Sharp. (SST)(3 pages)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Court will take no action on Plaintiff's January 11, 2019 letter (Doc. #6 ). (See document for further details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/28/19. (LAD)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of David Lee Sharp. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/15/19. (LAD)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff's letter (Doc. #5 ) seeking the appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice. The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/15/19. (LAD)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE re Plaintiff's Life being threatened by David Lee Sharp. (5 pages; styled as letter to the Clerk) (RMV)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by David Lee Sharp. (3 pages) (REK)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (DXD)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by David Lee Sharp (1 page). (DXD)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by David Lee Sharp (3 pages). (DXD)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by David Lee Sharp (7 pages). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharp v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknow Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ralenkotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?