CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company v. Watts Regulator Company et al
Plaintiff: CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company and ACA Insurance Company
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Watts Regulator Company and Watts Water Technologies Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2018cv04420
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Remark: As to attorney Keith E Smith - removed for noncompliance of admission requirements; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Watts Regulator Company, Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (Polson, Adam)
January 10, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Watts Regulator Company, Watts Water Technologies Incorporated.(Polson, Adam)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Schumacher, Douglas)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 1/10/2019 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/19/2018. (MMO)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Watts Regulator Company, Watts Water Technologies Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Watts Water Technologies, Inc. for Watts Regulator Company. (Polson, Adam)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (First Request) by Watts Regulator Company, Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Extension)(Polson, Adam)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (MMO)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/6/2018. (MMO)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/6/2018. (MMO)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Watts Regulator Company, Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (MFR)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Watts Regulator Company, Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16269156. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-4420-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
December 4, 2018 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate re Compulsory Arbitration and Demand for Jury Trial upon Watts Regulator Company on 11/5/2018 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 11/7/2018) and upon Watts Water Technologies Incorporated on 11/6/2018 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 11/13/2018). (MFR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-053045. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16269156 filed by Watts Water Technologies Incorporated, Watts Regulator Company. (Polson, Adam) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company v. Watts Regulator Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Regulator Company
Represented By: Keith E Smith
Represented By: Adam S Polson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Water Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Keith E Smith
Represented By: Adam S Polson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas Michael Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACA Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas Michael Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?