Konka v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Russ Konka
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2018cv04461
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Arizona District Court
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Holmstrom, Kristina)
December 20, 2018 12 *NOTICE re: Service of Docket Entries by Russ Konka re: #6 Notice (Other), #5 Order. (Koelbel, Kevin) *Modified to correct document link on 12/21/2018 (REK).
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER granting the #10 Stipulation and allowing Defendant up to and including January 28, 2019 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/19/2018. (LFIG)
December 19, 2018 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holmstrom, Kristina)
December 13, 2018 9 NOTICE re: of Service of Court Order by Russ Konka re: #5 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Koelbel, Kevin)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 3/5/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/13/2018. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
December 12, 2018 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Russ Konka: Affidavit of Process re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Magistrate Availability, Civil Cover Sheet upon Life Insurance Company of North America on 12/07/2018. (Koelbel, Kevin)
December 11, 2018 6 *DEMAND for Jury Trial by Plaintiff by Russ Konka . (Koelbel, Kevin) *Modified to correct event on 12/12/2018 (REK).
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/7/2018. (LFIG)
December 6, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 6, 2018 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16271000. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-4461-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
December 6, 2018 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Russ Konka. (Koelbel, Kevin) (KEP)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16271000 filed by Russ Konka. (Koelbel, Kevin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Konka v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russ Konka
Represented By: Erin Rose Ronstadt
Represented By: Clayton Warren Richards
Represented By: Kevin Koelbel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Kristina Novotny Holmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?