Pinales et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI et al

Plaintiff: Antonio Pinales and Maria Pinales
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2018cv04464
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Arizona District Court
0 Judge: John Z Boyle
1 Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO SUPERIOR COURT - Plaintiffs' #7 Motion to Remand is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to remand this matter to Maricopa County Superior Court without delay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the February 8, 2019 Scheduling Conference (see Doc. #13 ). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter)(MSA)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/9/19. (JAMA)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) andmotions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that wouldbe the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order onDefendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/9/19. (JAMA)
December 27, 2018 11 RESPONSE to Motion re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI. (Cook, Eric)
December 20, 2018 10 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-04464-PHX-JJT. FURTHER ORDERED affirming the Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2019, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
December 19, 2018 9 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
December 13, 2018 7 *MOTION to Remand to State Court by Antonio Pinales, Maria Pinales. (Hammond, Kurt) *Document is not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Attorney notified on 12/14/2018 (EJA).
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE for 1/28/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 12/11/18. (EJA)
December 7, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI.(Cook, Eric)
December 6, 2018 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
December 6, 2018 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16273781. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-04464-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (BAR)
December 6, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI. (Cook, Eric) (BAR)
December 6, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-011585. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16273781 filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI. (Cook, Eric) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinales et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Pinales
Represented By: Kurt Eugene Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Pinales
Represented By: Kurt Eugene Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI
Represented By: Lynn M Allen
Represented By: Eric Lawrence Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?