Holland v. Ryan et al
Petitioner: James Robert Holland
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 2:2018cv04543
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle (PS)
Referring Judge: John Z Boyle
2 Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Receipt of Electronic Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Arizona Attorney General on 01/31/19. The Attorney General's Office will file a Notice of Appearance within five (5) business days that identifies the respondents that are represented or, in the alternative, will notify the Court if the Attorney General is not able to accept service for and/or represent any of the named respondents. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Sparks, Jeffrey)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Arizona Attorney General Service Order (2254) - The Clerk shall serve a copy of the Petition (Doc. #1 ) and this Order on the Respondent(s) and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by electronic mail. Within 2 business days, the Attorney General's Office will acknowledge receipt of the Petition and the Court's Order and within 5 business days will file a notice of appearance. Respondents must answer the Petition within 40 days of the date of service. Petitioner may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/31/19. (Attachments: #1 Petition Doc 1)(DXD)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number PHX204458. (SLQ)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must pay the $5.00 filing fee. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Petitioner fails to comply. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/12/18. (DXD)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (REK)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by James Robert Holland. (2 pages) (REK)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by James Robert Holland. (18 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Robert Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?