Supima v. Tradeline Enterprises Private Limited
Plaintiff: Supima
Defendant: Tradeline Enterprises Private Limited
Case Number: 2:2018cv04547
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Referring Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: This case is reassigned to Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-18-4547-PHX-SMM. Any pending deadlines and/or hearings are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Tradeline Enterprises Private Limited. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Supima. (King, Anthony)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on March 8, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/10/2018. (REK)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Supima. (King, Anthony)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Supima. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16279714. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-4547-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16279714 filed by Supima. (King, Anthony) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #4 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #5 Exhibit 2 Part 3, #6 Exhibit 2 Part 4, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Supima v. Tradeline Enterprises Private Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supima
Represented By: Charles F Hauff
Represented By: Anthony Tom King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradeline Enterprises Private Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?