Acosta v. Valley Wide Plastering Construction Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: R Alexander Acosta
Defendant: Rose Guerrero, Jesse Guerrero, Jr., Jesus Guerrero, Valley Wide Plastering Construction Incorporated, JR Guerrero, Jesse Guerrero and Valley Wide Plastering Construction Incorporated an Arizona corporation doing business as Valley Wide Plastering Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2018cv04756
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Jesse Guerrero, Jr, Jesus Guerrero, Rose Guerrero, Valley Wide Plastering Construction Incorporated. (Ingold, Susanne)
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff R Alexander Acosta. (Stearns, Tara)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED the Scheduling Conference, presently set for 5/17/19 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET. Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/19 at 01:30 p.m. in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Ordered by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow. (GMS, ag) ( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valley Wide Plastering Construction Incorporated. (Ingold, Susanne)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jesse Guerrero, Jr, Jesus Guerrero, Rose Guerrero, Valley Wide Plastering Construction Incorporated.(Ingold, Susanne)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/8/19. (DXD)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by R Alexander Acosta: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/26/2018 to Jesus Guerrero, aka Jesse Guerrero . (Stearns, Tara)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by R Alexander Acosta: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/26/2018 to Rose Guerrero . (Stearns, Tara)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by R Alexander Acosta: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/26/2018 to Jesse Guerrero, Jr., aka J.R. Guerrero . (Stearns, Tara)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by R Alexander Acosta: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/26/2018 to Valley Wide Plastering Construction, Inc. . (Stearns, Tara)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE re: 5 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) by Plaintiff R Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Valley Wide Plastering Construction, Inc., dba Valley Wide Plastering, Inc., #2 Summons to Jesus Guerrero, aka Jesse Guerrero, #3 Summons to Rose Guerrero, #4 Summons to Jesse Guerrero, Jr., aka J.R. Guerrero)(Stearns, Tara)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed.R.Civ. P. 4(m) on March 19, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/19/2018. (REK)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by R Alexander Acosta. One defendant should be listed per summons. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected documents. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-4756-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by R Alexander Acosta. (Stearns, Tara) (KEP)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by R Alexander Acosta. (Stearns, Tara) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Valley Wide Plastering Construction Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Guerrero
Represented By: Susanne Elizabeth Ingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Guerrero, Jr.
Represented By: Susanne Elizabeth Ingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Guerrero
Represented By: Susanne Elizabeth Ingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Wide Plastering Construction Incorporated
Represented By: Susanne Elizabeth Ingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JR Guerrero
Represented By: Susanne Elizabeth Ingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Guerrero
Represented By: Susanne Elizabeth Ingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Wide Plastering Construction Incorporated an Arizona corporation doing business as Valley Wide Plastering Incorporated
Represented By: Susanne Elizabeth Ingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Tara E Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?