Hawkins v. Bauer
Plaintiff: Sabrina Gibson Hawkins
Defendant: Joel Scott Bauer
Case Number: 2:2019cv00236
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Defendant Joel Scott Bauer. (Hodgson, Cheryl)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension Time to File Case Management Report and Continue Case Management Conference. Parties shall file their Joint Case Management Report no later than March 8, 2019. Vacating the March 8, 2019 case management conference and resetting same to April 9, 2019 at 8:45 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 3/6/2019. (TCA)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Joel Scott Bauer. (Breit, Michelle)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Case Management Report by Joel Scott Bauer. (Attachments: #1 Time Schedule Order Proposed Order)(Hodgson, Cheryl)
February 5, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Cheryl Hodgson on behalf of defendant Joel Scott Bauer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Court Documents by Joel Scott Bauer on Plaintiff Hawkins. (Breit, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Joel Scott Bauer. (Breit, Michelle)
January 19, 2019 Filing 8 *First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative MOTION for Change of Venue by Joel Scott Bauer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(Breit, Michelle). *Added MOTION to Change Venue; attorney noticed on 1/22/19 (SLQ).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 3/8/2019 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/15/2019. (TCA)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/15/2019. (TCA)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO121)(SIB)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (SIB)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SIB)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16404800. This case has been assigned to the Honorable (Breit, Michelle). All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-236-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SIB)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from White Tank Justice Court, case number CC2018231478. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16404800 filed by Joel Scott Bauer. (Breit, Michelle) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(SIB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Gibson Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Scott Bauer
Represented By: Michelle Gail Breit
Represented By: Cheryl Hodgson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?