Bruno v. Abeyta et al
Appellee: Sherman & Howard LLC and Gary Abeyta
Appellant: Paul Leonard Bruno
Undetermined: Symmetry Construction LLC, Par Avion Travel Incorporated and Schoenberg Family Law Group PC
Trustee: Maureen Gaughan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00250
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's order filed January 31, 2019, the appeal is dismissed and the case is closed. (REK)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing this appeal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/31/2019. (REK)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sherman & Howard LLC. (Weatherwax, David)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Within ten days of the date of entry of this Order and as he was previously ordered to do by the BAP (Doc. 1 at 19-20), Appellant Paul Leonard Bruno shall provide the Court with verification that he paid the U.S. Bankruptcy Court the filing and docketing fees for this appeal, or otherwise file with this Court an adequate legal explanation as to why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to pay the filing and docketing fees. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this appeal. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/16/19. (EJA)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Par Avion Travel Incorporated, Schoenberg Family Law Group PC, Sherman & Howard LLC, Symmetry Construction LLC. (REK)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Appellate Panel for the Ninth Circuit by Sherman & Howard LLC. (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruno v. Abeyta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sherman & Howard LLC
Represented By: Bryan A Albue
Represented By: David A Weatherwax
Represented By: Craig Alan Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gary Abeyta
Represented By: Justin Vincent Niedzialek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Paul Leonard Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Symmetry Construction LLC
Represented By: Gregory John Gnepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Par Avion Travel Incorporated
Represented By: Michael J Zdancewicz
Represented By: Marc Steven Windtberg
Represented By: Thomas K Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Schoenberg Family Law Group PC
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Maureen Gaughan
Represented By: Steven Joseph Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?