Naumann et al v. Estate of Janet Odenwald et al
Plaintiff: Roger Naumann, Second Home Pet Resort Pension Plan and Cheryl Naumann
Defendant: Wealth Management Solutions LLC, Estate of Janet Odenwald, Manfred Kieser and David S Rosenthal
Case Number: 2:2019cv00258
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Cheryl Naumann, Roger Naumann. (Wilson, Daryl)
February 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Cheryl Naumann, Roger Naumann. (Wilson, Daryl)
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Cheryl Naumann, Roger Naumann. (Wilson, Daryl)
February 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Cheryl Naumann, Roger Naumann. (Wilson, Daryl)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P.4(m): ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendant(s) in this matter, without further notice or order from the Court, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on April 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/16/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/16/2019. (LFIG)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 3 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only), #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs Cheryl Naumann, Roger Naumann, Second Home Pet Resort Pension Plan. (Wilson, Daryl)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Roger Naumann, Cheryl Naumann, Second Home Pet Resort Pension Plan. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16414533. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-0258-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16414533 filed by Second Home Pet Resort Pension Plan, Roger Naumann, Cheryl Naumann. (Wilson, Daryl)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naumann et al v. Estate of Janet Odenwald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wealth Management Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Janet Odenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manfred Kieser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Naumann
Represented By: Daryl Richard Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Home Pet Resort Pension Plan
Represented By: Daryl Richard Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Naumann
Represented By: Daryl Richard Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?