Pacesetter Consulting LLC v. Kapreilian et al
Plaintiff: Pacesetter Consulting LLC
Defendant: Agricare Incorporated, Eastside Packing Incorporated, Tom Avenelis, Craig L Kapreilian, Daniel Duda, Mark Bassetti, Fruit World Nursery Incorporated, Herbert A Kapreilian, Duda & Sons LLC and Mark R Bassetti
Case Number: 2:2019cv00388
Filed: January 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #22 First MOTION to Dismiss Party Daniel Duda filed by Daniel Duda. (O'Daniel, David)
March 22, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #20 First MOTION to Dismiss Party Duda & Sons, LLC filed by Duda & Sons LLC. (O'Daniel, David)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation (Doc. #36 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall set aside the March 7, 2019 entry of default against Defendants Fruit World Nursery Incorporated and Craig L. Kapreilian (Doc. #27 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Set Aside Entry of Defaults by Defendants Fruit World Nursery Incorporated and Craig L. Kapreilian (Doc. #34 ) is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Craig Kapreilian, Herbert Kapreilian, Fruit World Nursery, Inc. and Eastside Packing, Inc. shall respond to the First Amended Complaint by April 1, 2019 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/22/19. (MAW)
March 21, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) to defense counsel recently appearing herein filed by Plaintiff Pacesetter Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(McGill, Gregory)
March 21, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE re: of Service of Order & MIDP Attachments by Pacesetter Consulting LLC re: #23 Order, Set/Reset Hearings MIDP notices, Checklist & Gen Order 17-08. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(McGill, Gregory)
March 20, 2019 Filing 36 STIPULATION re: #27 Clerk's Entry of Default JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Eastside Packing Incorporated, Fruit World Nursery Incorporated, Craig L Kapreilian, Herbert A Kapreilian. (Cherney, Craig)
March 18, 2019 Filing 35 *NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #33 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel, #34 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Fruit World Nursery Incorporated, Herbert A Kapreilian, Craig L Kapreilian, Eastside Packing Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Jonathan Ibsen but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Craig Cherney. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) *Modified to add document number on 3/18/2019 (SLQ).
March 18, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Set Aside Default DEFENDANTS RULE 55-C MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULTS by Fruit World Nursery Incorporated, Craig L Kapreilian. (Cherney, Craig)
March 18, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Peter Cherney on behalf of Eastside Packing Incorporated, Fruit World Nursery Incorporated, Craig L Kapreilian, Herbert A Kapreilian. (Cherney, Craig)
March 14, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Duda & Sons LLC. (O'Daniel, David)
March 14, 2019 Filing 31 *Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #29 Response to Motion to Dismiss Doc 29 by Pacesetter Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS 9-13, #2 Certificate of Record CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(McGill, Gregory) *Modified on 3/15/2019 to correct event type (MSA).
March 13, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Strike #28 Notice (Other) NOTICE OF FILING REPLACEMENT EXHIBIT by Pacesetter Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS 1-3, #2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER, #3 Certificate of Record Certificate of Service)(McGill, Gregory)
March 8, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re: #20 First MOTION to Dismiss Party Duda & Sons, LLC , #22 First MOTION to Dismiss Party Daniel Duda , #21 First MOTION to Dismiss Party Duda & Sons, LLC which Response in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss is filed by Pacesetter Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS 1-4, #2 Exhibit EXHIBITS 5-8, #3 Certificate of Record Certificate of Service)(McGill, Gregory)
March 8, 2019 Filing 28 *NOTICE of Filing Replacement Exhibit to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint re: #22 as to Daniel Duda by Daniel Duda . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Replacement Exhibit)(O'Daniel, David) *Modified text and added document link on 3/11/2019 (SLQ).
March 7, 2019 Filing 27 *SET ASIDE by Doc. #39 * Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT - Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendants Craig Kapreilian and Fruit World Nursery. (MSA) Modified on 3/22/2019 (MAW).
March 6, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Pacesetter Consulting LLC. (McGill, Gregory)
March 5, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Craig Kapreilian and Fruit World Nursery, Inc by Pacesetter Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Default, #3 Certificate of Record Certificate of Service)(McGill, Gregory)
March 4, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Duda & Sons LLC. (MAW)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dominic W Lanza [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/4/19. (MAW)
February 28, 2019 Filing 22 First MOTION to Dismiss Party Daniel Duda by Daniel Duda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(O'Daniel, David)
February 28, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION to Dismiss Party Duda & Sons, LLC by Duda & Sons LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(O'Daniel, David)
February 28, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION to Dismiss Party Duda & Sons, LLC by Duda & Sons LLC. (O'Daniel, David)
February 28, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Mark R Bassetti.(O'Daniel, David)
February 28, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Agricare Incorporated. (Moolenaar, Peter)
February 28, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Agricare Incorporated, Tom Avenelis.(Moolenaar, Peter)
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pacesetter Consulting LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Amended Complaint upon Herbert Kapreilian on 02/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(McGill, Gregory)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for leave to effectuate service by alternative means is denied without prejudice (Doc. #14 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file, within 14 days of the date of this Order, a new motion for leave to serve by alternative means. The motion must clearly explain the rules and/or laws that would permit the Court to grant the relief it seeks [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/20/19. (MAW)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 EX PARTE Emergency MOTION for Service by Publication or Other Alternative Service by Pacesetter Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS 1-2, #2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(McGill, Gregory)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pacesetter Consulting LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Amended Complaint upon Eastside Packing, Inc; Craig L. Kapreilian; Fruit World Nursery, Inc; Agricare, Inc; Tom Avenelis; Duda & Sons, LLC; Daniel Duda; Mark R Bassetti on 02/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(McGill, Gregory)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Herbert A Kapreilian. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Submitted by Pacesetter Consulting LLC. (McGill, Gregory)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Summons Submitted filed by Pacesetter Consulting LLC. Party name on summons for Herbert A Kapreilian does not match docket and/or complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Agricare Incorporated, Tom Avenelis, Mark R Bassetti, Daniel Duda, Duda & Sons LLC, Eastside Packing Incorporated, Fruit World Nursery Incorporated, Craig L Kapreilian. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Pacesetter Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Eastside Packing, Inc, #2 Summons Craig L Kapreillian, #3 Summons Fruit World Nursery, Inc, #4 Summons Agricare, Inc, #5 Summons Tom Avenelis, #6 Summons Duda & Sons, LLC, #7 Summons Daniel Duda, #8 Summons Mark R Bassetti)(McGill, Gregory)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Pacesetter Consulting LLC.(McGill, Gregory)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on April 29, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16456593. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-00388-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
January 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pacesetter Consulting LLC. (McGill, Gregory) (BAC)
January 26, 2019 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Pacesetter Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-8, #2 Exhibit 9-11, #3 Exhibit 12-15, #4 Exhibit 16-19)(BAC)
January 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16456593 filed by Pacesetter Consulting LLC. (McGill, Gregory) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacesetter Consulting LLC v. Kapreilian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacesetter Consulting LLC
Represented By: Gregory George McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agricare Incorporated
Represented By: Peter Jon Moolenaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastside Packing Incorporated
Represented By: Craig Peter Cherney
Represented By: Jonathan Philip Ibsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Avenelis
Represented By: Peter Jon Moolenaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig L Kapreilian
Represented By: Craig Peter Cherney
Represented By: Jonathan Philip Ibsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Duda
Represented By: David L O'Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bassetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fruit World Nursery Incorporated
Represented By: Craig Peter Cherney
Represented By: Jonathan Philip Ibsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert A Kapreilian
Represented By: Craig Peter Cherney
Represented By: Jonathan Philip Ibsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duda & Sons LLC
Represented By: David L O'Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R Bassetti
Represented By: David L O'Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?