Wen v. General Motors LLC

Plaintiff: Shunlun Wen
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00819
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/5/19. (JAMA)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying General Motors Holdings LLC and by General Motors Company as Corporate Parents for General Motors LLC. (Fischer, C) *Modified record on 4/5/2019 (DXD).
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Fischer, C)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shunlun Wen: Proof of Service re: Summons upon General Motors LLC on 02/13/19. (Shumway, G)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 4/4/19 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Plaintiff shall file proof of service of the Complaint and summons within seven days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/27/19. (DXD)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT AND PROPOSED ORDER by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, C)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 10, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/12/19. (JAMA)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/12/19. (JAMA)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to General Motors LLC. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16513063. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-819-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Shunlun Wen. (Shumway, G) (DLC)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16513063 filed by Shunlun Wen. (Shumway, G) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wen v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shunlun Wen
Represented By: Jay Lawrence Ciulla
Represented By: Brent Michael Ghelfi
Represented By: G Lynn Shumway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: C Megan Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?