Nafarrate v. Moreno's Mexican Grill LLC et al

Plaintiff: Edgar Nafarrate
Defendant: Jose Angel Moreno, Moreno's Mexican Grill LLC, Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Six LLC, Martina Moreno, Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Two LLC, Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Seven LLC, Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Five LLC, Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Four LLC, Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Eight LLC and Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Three LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00828
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 the parties' Stipulation and Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that all Defendants have to and including 4/22/2019 to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint. There will be no further extensions of this deadline. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 3/29/2019. (RMW)
March 28, 2019 Filing 19 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Edgar Nafarrate: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 3/19/2019 to Martina Moreno . (Moulton, David)
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Edgar Nafarrate: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 3/19/2019 to Jose Angel Moreno . (Moulton, David)
March 28, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation and Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint by Edgar Nafarrate. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moulton, David)
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 Service Returned Unexecuted by Edgar Nafarrate : Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit A to Complaint, Notice of Availablity of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdication, Notice to Parties MIDP, Standard Civil Track Initial Order as to Martina Moreno. (Bonnett, Daniel)
March 20, 2019 Filing 15 Service Returned Unexecuted by Edgar Nafarrate : Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit A to Complaint, Notice of Availablity of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdication, Notice to Parties MIDP, Standard Civil Track Initial Order as to Jose Angel Moreno. (Bonnett, Daniel)
March 20, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Edgar Nafarrate: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit A to Complaint, Notice of Availablity of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdication, Notice to Parties MIDP, Standard Civil Track Initial Order upon Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Eight, LLC on 3/4/19. (Bonnett, Daniel)
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Edgar Nafarrate: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit A to Complaint, Notice of Availablity of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdication, Notice to Parties MIDP, Standard Civil Track Initial Order upon Morenos Mexican Grill Number Seven, LLC on 3/4/19. (Bonnett, Daniel)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Edgar Nafarrate: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit A to Complaint, Notice of Availablity of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdication, Notice to Parties MIDP, Standard Civil Track Initial Order upon Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Six, LLC on 3/4/19. (Bonnett, Daniel)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Edgar Nafarrate: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit A to Complaint, Notice of Availablity of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdication, Notice to Parties MIDP, Standard Civil Track Initial Order upon Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Five, LLC on 3/4/19. (Bonnett, Daniel)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Edgar Nafarrate: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit A to Complaint, Notice of Availablity of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdication, Notice to Parties MIDP, Standard Civil Track Initial Order upon Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Four, LLC on 3/4/19. (Bonnett, Daniel)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Edgar Nafarrate: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit A to Complaint, Notice of Availablity of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdication, Notice to Parties MIDP, Standard Civil Track Initial Order upon Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Three, LLC on 3/4/19. (Bonnett, Daniel)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Edgar Nafarrate: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit A to Complaint, Notice of Availablity of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdication, Notice to Parties MIDP, Standard Civil Track Initial Order upon Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Two, LLC on 3/4/19. (Bonnett, Daniel)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Edgar Nafarrate: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit A to Complaint, Notice of Availablity of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdication, Notice to Parties MIDP, Standard Civil Track Initial Order upon Moreno's Mexican Grill, LLC on 3/4/19. (Bonnett, Daniel)
March 7, 2019 Remark: Pro Hac Motion granted for David I Moulton on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED, if not already accomplished prior to the date of this Order, that Plaintiff shall effect service of the Complaint and Summons upon all Defendants no later than 90 days after the filing of the Complaint. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/8/19. (MSA)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jose Angel Moreno, Martina Moreno, Moreno's Mexican Grill LLC, Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Eight LLC, Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Five LLC, Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Four LLC, Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Seven LLC, Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Six LLC, Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Three LLC, Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Two LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(BAR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16513509. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-00828-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Edgar Nafarrate. (Bonnett, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(BAR)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16513509 filed by Edgar Nafarrate. (Bonnett, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nafarrate v. Moreno's Mexican Grill LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Angel Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreno's Mexican Grill LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Six LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martina Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Two LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Seven LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Five LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Four LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Eight LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreno's Mexican Grill Number Three LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Nafarrate
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Represented By: David I Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?