Progeny LLC et al v. Sonoran Desert Business Holdings Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Progeny LLC and Sonoran Desert Pet Resort Anthem LLC
Defendant: Bobbie Underwood, Sonoran Desert Business Holdings Incorporated, Donald Underwood and Big Sky Pet Resort LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00846
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R.Bolton. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-846-PHX-SRB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 3, 2019 Filing 19 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Crimi Speth on behalf of Big Sky Pet Resort LLC, Sonoran Desert Business Holdings Incorporated, Bobbie Underwood, Donald Underwood. (Speth, Maria)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting a one-time extension of 30 days to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 3/21/19. (DXD)
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to Big Sky Pet Resort LLC, Sonoran Desert Business Holdings Incorporated, Bobbie Underwood, Donald Underwood. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Big Sky Pet Resort LLC, Sonoran Desert Business Holdings Incorporated, Bobbie Underwood, Donald Underwood. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Cohen, Larry)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Progeny LLC, Sonoran Desert Pet Resort Anthem LLC: Acceptance of Service re: Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons for each Defendant, Notice to Parties Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, and Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge upon Defendants Sonoran Desert Business Holdings, Inc., Big Sky Pet Resort, LLC, Donald and Bobbie Underwood on February 28, 2019. (Lee-Cota, Jennifer)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 *NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information by Plaintiffs Progeny LLC, Sonoran Desert Pet Resort Anthem LLC. (Lee-Cota, Jennifer) *Modified to correct event on 2/20/2019 (DXD).
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sonoran Desert Business Holdings Incorporated . (Lee-Cota, Jennifer) *Modified text on 2/13/2019 (DXD).
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progeny LLC. (Lee-Cota, Jennifer)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Progeny LLC, Sonoran Desert Pet Resort Anthem LLC. (BAR)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(BAR)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Big Sky Pet Resort LLC, Sonoran Desert Business Holdings Incorporated, Bobbie Underwood, Donald Underwood. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16515027. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-00846-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAR)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Progeny LLC, Sonoran Desert Pet Resort Anthem LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Lee-Cota, Jennifer)(BAR)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16515027 filed by Progeny LLC, Sonoran Desert Pet Resort Anthem LLC. (Lee-Cota, Jennifer) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B (part 1), #4 Exhibit B (part 2))(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progeny LLC et al v. Sonoran Desert Business Holdings Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbie Underwood
Represented By: Larry J Cohen
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Represented By: Aaron K Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoran Desert Business Holdings Incorporated
Represented By: Larry J Cohen
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Represented By: Aaron K Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Underwood
Represented By: Larry J Cohen
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Represented By: Aaron K Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Sky Pet Resort LLC
Represented By: Larry J Cohen
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Represented By: Aaron K Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progeny LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Bruce Edward Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonoran Desert Pet Resort Anthem LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Bruce Edward Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?