Conner et al v. Wilmington Trust NA

Appellant: Deanna Connor, Kenneth Connor, Kenneth Alan Conner and Deanna Conner
Appellee: Wilmington Trust, NA and Wilmington Trust NA
Case Number: 2:2019cv01076
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Extend (Doc. #6 ) is granted. The deadline for the Opening Brief is extended from April 19, 2019 to May 3, 2019. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/10/19. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Extend Time for Opening Brief to May 3, 2019 by Deanna Conner, Kenneth Alan Conner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodman, Christopher)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: PURSUANT to Local Rules of Bankruptcy Appeal Procedure 8009-1, 8009-2, 8010-1 and 8010-2, and FRPB 8009(a), the Appellant shall serve and file an opening brief (not to exceed 17 pages) with the Clerk of the United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days of the date this Order is filed [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/5/19. (MAW)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Wilmington Trust NA. (DXD)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (DXD)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner et al v. Wilmington Trust NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Deanna Connor
Represented By: Christopher Moran Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kenneth Connor
Represented By: Christopher Moran Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kenneth Alan Conner
Represented By: Christopher Moran Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Deanna Conner
Represented By: Christopher Moran Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wilmington Trust, NA
Represented By: Michael Ross Hogue
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wilmington Trust NA
Represented By: Michael Ross Hogue
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?