Nall v. Mackenzie Collier Interiors LLC
Plaintiff: Skip Nall
Defendant: Mackenzie Collier Interiors LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01186
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Richard Liebowitz on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set on April 23, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing Plaintiff to show cause in writing within seven days of the date of this Order for his failure to comply with the Court's Order and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court will dismiss this case without further notice if Plaintiff fails to show cause in writing within seven days [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/18/19. (MAW)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #13 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Mackenzie Collier Interiors LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 *NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Mackenzie Collier Interiors LLC. (Halsey, Chase) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation; attorney noticed on 3/29/2019 (SST).
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for April 23, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 502, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/21/19. (MAW)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #9 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within 7 days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within 7 days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (DXD)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mackenzie Collier Interiors LLC. (Halsey, Chase)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mackenzie Collier Interiors LLC.(Halsey, Chase)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Skip Nall. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Skip Nall. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - Title Page does not include filing attorney information in upper left corner. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Mackenzie Collier Interiors LLC. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16559854. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1186-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Skip Nall. (Liebowitz, Richard) (KEP)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Skip Nall. (Liebowitz, Richard) (KEP)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16559854 filed by Skip Nall. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nall v. Mackenzie Collier Interiors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skip Nall
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackenzie Collier Interiors LLC
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Represented By: Alicia Marie Casale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?