Pulice v. Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society et al
Plaintiff: Tina Pulice
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society
Case Number: 2:2019cv01214
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Referring Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #17 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by Tina Pulice. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
April 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society. (Gailey, Megan)
April 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Tina Pulice. (Smith, Donald)
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society.(Gailey, Megan)
March 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #14 Notice (Other) filed by Tina Pulice. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE re: Service by Tina Pulice . (Smith, Donald)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2019 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 3/11/2019. (TCA)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 3/11/2019. (TCA)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R. Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-1214-PHX-SMB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society. (Gailey, Megan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16565103. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-01214-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions.(BAC)
February 21, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Waiver of Service of Summons by Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society. (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 2/14/19)(BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-052437. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16565103 filed by Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society. (Gailey, Megan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1-3)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pulice v. Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society
Represented By: Nicholas James Scavio
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Gailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Pulice
Represented By: Donald H Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?