Meyer v. Arizona, State of et al

Plaintiff: Jesse Meyer
Defendant: Deborah Hager, Arizona, State of, Gregory A McKay, New Foundation, Arizona Department of Child Safety and Kathryn French
Case Number: 2:2019cv01229
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER pursuant to #23 Stipulation to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2019 is vacated and reset for 6/14/2019 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/17/2019. (MMO)
April 16, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION To Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Deborah Hager. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Daniel)
April 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #19 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by Deborah Hager. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
April 15, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant New Foundation. (Hall, N)
April 15, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Arizona Department of Child Safety, Arizona, State of, Kathryn French, Gregory A McKay. (Bowen, James)
April 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Deborah Hager. (O'Connor, Daniel)
April 5, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 9:00 AM is RESET IN TIME ONLY. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference reset for 4/23/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
March 15, 2019 Filing 17 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by New Foundation. (Grasso, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by New Foundation.(Grasso, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 Amended ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Deborah Hager.(O'Connor, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Arizona Department of Child Safety, Arizona, State of, Kathryn French, Gregory A McKay. (Bowen, James)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Arizona Department of Child Safety, Arizona, State of, Kathryn French, Gregory A McKay.(Bowen, James)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Foundation. (Grasso, Robert)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 3/15/2019 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/1/2019. (MMO)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 *Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal by Arizona Department of Child Safety, Arizona, State of, Kathryn French, Gregory A McKay. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowen, James) *Modified to correct event/linkage on 3/1/2019 (DXD).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/22/2019. (MMO)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/22/2019. (MMO)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Grasso, Jr on behalf of New Foundation. (Grasso, Robert)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J O'Connor on behalf of Deborah Hager. (O'Connor, Daniel)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (Attachments: #1 MIDP)(MCO)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16567469. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-01229-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
February 22, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** ANSWER to Complaint by Deborah Hager. ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.***(MCO)
February 22, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: Summons/Complaint/Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration/Order/Minute Entry upon State of Arizona/Arizona Department of Child Safety, The New Foundation, Kathry French, Gregory A McKay, Deborah Hager on 1/25/2019. (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-091523. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16567469 filed by Kathryn French, Arizona Department of Child Safety, Arizona, State of, Gregory A McKay. (Bowen, James) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Hager
Represented By: Daniel J O'Connor
Represented By: Karen Johnson Stillwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: James B Bowen
Represented By: Cynthia Dawn Starkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory A McKay
Represented By: James B Bowen
Represented By: Cynthia Dawn Starkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Foundation
Represented By: Robert Grasso, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Child Safety
Represented By: James B Bowen
Represented By: Cynthia Dawn Starkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn French
Represented By: James B Bowen
Represented By: Cynthia Dawn Starkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Meyer
Represented By: Richard Moreno Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?