Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Michael Ross Johnson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01273
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties must fully comply with the following deadlines and procedures: Within 60 days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within 15 days after service of Defendant's answering brief. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/12/19. (LAD)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge James A. Teilborg. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-1273-PHX-JAT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Allison Cheung appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Cheung, Allison)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, United States Attorney General and United States Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16570025. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D. Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1273-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Michael Ross Johnson. (Melkonoff, Rodney) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16570025 filed by Michael Ross Johnson. (Melkonoff, Rodney) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ross Johnson
Represented By: Rodney A Melkonoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?