Kiss v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Jody Marie Kiss
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01307
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gina Tomaselli appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Tomaselli, Gina)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jody Marie Kiss: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Matthew G Whitaker, Acting US Attorney General (03/14/19); Nancy A. Berryhill, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (03/12/19); Elizabeth Strange, First Assistant US Attorney for the District of Arizona (03/11/19) on 03/14/19; 03/12/19; 03/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic return receipts and certified mail receipts)(Caldwell, Mark)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: See order for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/6/2019. (LMR)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 . Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint and shall file proof of service no later than May 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/6/2019. (LMR)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P. Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1307-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Jody Marie Kiss. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jody Marie Kiss. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KEP)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jody Marie Kiss. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiss v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Marie Kiss
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Gina Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?