Martinez v. United States of America
Petitioner: Ernie Martinez
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv01324
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine (PS)
Referring Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Alien Detainee - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) by Petitioner Ernie Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4) (SST) (74 pages)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. (MAP)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Mexico; Case Number 1:19-cv-00110 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Letter re transferring case to the U.S. District Court of Arizona by Clerk of Court. (ln) [Transferred from nmd on 2/26/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO TRANSFER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the District of Arizona. (ts) [Transferred from nmd on 2/26/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE for recommended findings and final disposition to Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth by District Judge James O. Browning (vv) [Transferred from nmd on 2/26/2019.]
February 5, 2019 District Judge James O. Browning and Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (mnb) [Transferred from nmd on 2/26/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Ernie Martinez. (mnb) [Transferred from nmd on 2/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ernie Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?