Cruz v. Nielsen et al
Petitioner: Ary Humberto Clavijo Cruz
Respondent: Chuck Keeton, William Barr, Kirstjen Nielsen and Enrique Lucero
Case Number: 2:2019cv01350
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles (PS)
Referring Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Alien Detainee - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Habeas Petition, Summons, Motion, and Order upon William Barr on 4/1/19. (GMP)
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Habeas Petition, Summons, Motion, and Order upon U.S. Attorney, District of Arizona on 3/28/19. (GMP)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Habeas Petition, Summons, Motion, and Order upon Enrique Lucero. (GMP)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Habeas Petition, Summons, Motion, and Order upon Chuck Keeton on 3/27/19. (GMP)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order with leave to refile in a new action. The Clerk of Court must serve: (1) a copy of the Summons, (2) the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. #1 ), (3) the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ), and (4) this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court must also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Petition, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and this Order to the United States Attorney General pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(B) and to Respondents pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of service to answer the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. #1 ). See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/25/19. (EJA) ).
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE re: Regarding Petitioner's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by Ary Humberto Clavijo Cruz re: #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Expedited Consideration Requested) . (Yost, Austin)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE re: of Subpoena to Chuck Keeton by Ary Humberto Clavijo Cruz . (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Calleros, Benjamin)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Expedited Consideration Requested) by Ary Humberto Clavijo Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ary Humberto Clavijo Cruz, #2 Declaration of Sean M. Berens, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Yost, Austin)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DLC)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Ary Humberto Clavijo Cruz. (Calleros, Benjamin) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(DLC)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Ary Humberto Clavijo Cruz. (Calleros, Benjamin) (DLC)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 0970-16582305 filed by Ary Humberto Clavijo Cruz. (Calleros, Benjamin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chuck Keeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Enrique Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ary Humberto Clavijo Cruz
Represented By: Benjamin C Calleros
Represented By: Sean Matthew Berens
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Austin Clark Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?