Brown v. Collection Bureau of America Limited

Plaintiff: Tracey Brown
Defendant: Collection Bureau of America Limited
Case Number: 2:2019cv01359
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tracey Brown: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice re MIDP upon Collection Bureau of America, LTD on 4/17/19. (Kent, Trinette)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for April 15, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order that Tracey Brown show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/15/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Collection Bureau of America Limited. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16585069. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z. Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1359-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Tracey Brown. (Kent, Trinette) (KEP)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16585069 filed by Tracey Brown. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Collection Bureau of America Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collection Bureau of America Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Brown
Represented By: Trinette G Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?