Smith v. Phoenix Financial Services LLC

Plaintiff: Clementine Smith
Defendant: Phoenix Financial Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01360
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Bridget S Bade
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Clementine Smith : Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice re MIDP upon Phoenix Financial Services, LLC on 4/17/19. (Kent, Trinette)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE re: of Plaintiff's Preference of Trial Location by Clementine Smith . (Kent, Trinette)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Each party shall file within fourteen days of the later of the filing of this Order or the filing of their pleading, a notice indicating their preferences (or lack thereof) on whether any trial in this case is held: (a) at the John M. Roll United States Courthouse in Yuma, Arizona; and/or (d) at the Sandra Day O'Connor United States Courthouse in Phoenix, Arizona. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any copies of filings for Magistrate Judge Metcalf provided pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.4 shall be forwarded to John M. Roll U.S. Courthouse, 98 West 1st Street, Suite 2400, Yuma, AZ 85364. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 4/2/19. (GMP)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-19-1360-PHX-JFM. Any deadlines and/or hearings are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for April 15, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order that Clementine Smith show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/15/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Phoenix Financial Services LLC. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16585252. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bridget S Bade. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1360-PHX-BSB. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Clementine Smith. (Kent, Trinette) (DLC)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16585252 filed by Clementine Smith. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Phoenix Financial Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Financial Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clementine Smith
Represented By: Trinette G Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?