High Speed Interconnects LLC v. Continental Precious Minerals Incorporated
Plaintiff: High Speed Interconnects LLC
Defendant: Continental Precious Minerals Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv01361
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 26 *DECLARATION of Rick Moscone re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Stay by Defendant Continental Precious Minerals Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Taylor, James) *Modified text on 4/23/2019 (REK).
April 22, 2019 Filing 25 *DECLARATION of Jeffrey Eilender re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Stay by Defendant Continental Precious Minerals Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Taylor, James) *Modified text on 4/23/2019 (REK).
April 22, 2019 Filing 24 *MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Stay by Continental Precious Minerals Incorporated. (Taylor, James). *Added MOTION to Stay on 4/23/2019 (REK).
March 21, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J. Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-1361-PHX-JJT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 20, 2019 Filing 22 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 20, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Joshua Wurtzel and Jeffrey Eilender on behalf of defendants. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time to respond to complaint by 30 days. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the 30-day extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 3/15/2019. (REK)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - Amotion pursuant to Rule 12(b) or 12(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is discouraged if any defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to filing a motion to dismiss or motion for judgment on the pleadings to determine whether it can be avoided. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file notice of service. See document for full details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 3/15/2019. (RMV)
March 14, 2019 Filing 18 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to Continental Precious Minerals Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
March 14, 2019 Filing 17 *DECLARATION of Joshua Wurtzel re: #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Continental Precious Minerals Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Taylor, James) *Modified text on 3/15/2019 (REK).
March 14, 2019 Filing 16 *MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Continental Precious Minerals Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, James) *Modified to correct motion type on 3/15/2019 (REK).
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James Hendrik Taylor on behalf of Continental Precious Minerals Incorporated. (Taylor, James)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by High Speed Interconnects LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Jury Demand, Consent to Exercise Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge, and Notice to Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon Continental Precious Minerals Incorporated via Chief Financial Officer Jing Peng on 2/28/2019. (Conant, Paul) *Modified to correct event and text on 3/14/2019 (REK).
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 6 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only), #1 Complaint Corrected Cover Sheet by Plaintiff High Speed Interconnects LLC. (Conant, Paul)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 *Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) *Modified to Reflect Duplicate Entry of Doc, 11 on 3/4/2019 (MAP).
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by High Speed Interconnects LLC. (Conant, Paul) *Modified text on 2/28/2019 (REK).
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 *PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by High Speed Interconnects LLC. (Conant, Paul) *Modified to correct event on 2/28/2019 (REK).
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to High Speed Interconnects LLC. (BAR)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by High Speed Interconnects LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Continental Precious Minerals Incorporated. (BAR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16586041. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-1361-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAR)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by High Speed Interconnects LLC. (Conant, Paul) (BAR)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16586041 filed by High Speed Interconnects LLC. (Conant, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: High Speed Interconnects LLC v. Continental Precious Minerals Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: High Speed Interconnects LLC
Represented By: Paul Allen Conant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Precious Minerals Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eilender
Represented By: James Hendrik Taylor
Represented By: Joshua Wurtzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?