Alba-Hernandez v. Whitaker et al
Petitioner: Julio C Alba-Hernandez
Respondent: Enrique M Lucero, Thomas Homan, Kris Kline, Matthew Whitaker and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 2:2019cv01452
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Referring Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Alien Detainee - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed April 2, 2019, Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and this action are dismissed. (RMV)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Petitioner's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Doc. #1 ) and this action are dismissed. Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #3 ) is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgement accordingly and terminate this case. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/2/2019. (RMV)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Julio C Alba-Hernandez. Reason for return: No longer in custody. Document number 3. (RMV)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Julio C Alba-Hernandez: 7819 E Roosevelt St, Scottsdale, AZ 85257. (RMV)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Julio C Alba-Hernandez. (27 pages) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(RMV)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 *NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (GMP) *Modified document restriction from public to case participants/public terminals on 3/5/2019 (CEI).
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 *PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number PHX205927 filed by Julio C Alba-Hernandez. (36 pages)(GMP) *Modified document restriction from public to case participants/public terminals on 3/5/2019 (CEI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alba-Hernandez v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Enrique M Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kris Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julio C Alba-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?