Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. A&E Solheim LLC et al
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company and Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: Anna M Solheim, Eric A Solheim, A&E Solheim LLC and A&E Solheim LLC doing business as A&E Auto Glass
Case Number: 2:2019cv01492
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER pursuant to #17 Stipulation: IT IS ORDERED that: 1. The time for the parties' respective compliance with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project is extended by forty five (45) days; and 2. The Case Management Conference is continued from May 7, 2019, to June 25, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/22/19. (MAW)
April 19, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Comply with MIDP and Adjourn Case Management Conference by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Comply)(Thorpe, William)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for May 7, 2019, at 2:15 p.m. in Courtroom 502, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/2/19. (MAW)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A&E Solheim LLC, Eric A Solheim, Anna M Solheim. (Ricciardi, Alfred)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by A&E Solheim LLC, Eric A Solheim, Anna M Solheim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Search Warrant)(Ricciardi, Alfred)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED approving the Stipulation (Doc. #12 ) and allowing Defendants A & E Solheim, LLC d/b/a A & E Auto Glass, Eric A. Solheim and Anna M. Solheim up to and including April 1, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc.1). Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/28/19. (MAW)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 *STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by A&E Solheim LLC, Eric A Solheim, Anna M Solheim. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricciardi, Alfred) *Modified to add filers on 3/28/2019 (RMV).
March 21, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Barry I Levy on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 19, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Michael Vanunu on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 19, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Max Saulter Gershenoff and Steven Henesy on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company: Certificate of Service re: Civil CS, Summons, Complaint, MIDP Notice, Notice of Magistrate, Corporate Disclosure Statements on 3/8/2019 upon A&E Solheim, LLC; Eric A. Solheim; Anna M. Solheim. (Thorpe, William) *Modified to clarify text on 3/15/2019 (RMV).
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Eric A Solheim. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company. (Thorpe, William)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Thorpe, William)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to A&E Solheim LLC, Eric A Solheim, Anna M Solheim. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16606258. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1492-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16606258 filed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (Thorpe, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5A, #7 Exhibit 5B, #8 Exhibit 5C, #9 Exhibit 5D, #10 Exhibit 5E, #11 Exhibit 5F, #12 Exhibit 5G, #13 Exhibit 5H, #14 Exhibit 5I, #15 Exhibit 5J, #16 Exhibit 5K, #17 Exhibit 5L, #18 Exhibit 5M, #19 Exhibit 5N, #20 Exhibit 5O)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. A&E Solheim LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna M Solheim
Represented By: J Tyrrell Taber
Represented By: Philip R Rupprecht
Represented By: Alfred W Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric A Solheim
Represented By: J Tyrrell Taber
Represented By: Philip R Rupprecht
Represented By: Alfred W Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&E Solheim LLC
Represented By: J Tyrrell Taber
Represented By: Philip R Rupprecht
Represented By: Alfred W Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&E Solheim LLC doing business as A&E Auto Glass
Represented By: J Tyrrell Taber
Represented By: Philip R Rupprecht
Represented By: Alfred W Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?