Wilson-Kinney v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Wilson-Kinney
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2019cv01493
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - IT IS ORDERED vacating Case Management Conference set for May 10, 2019. Discovery due by 1/17/2020. Dispositive motions due by 6/26/2020. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 5/1/19. (MSA)
April 30, 2019 Filing 17 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meyer, Cassandra)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE- Scheduling Conference set for 5/10/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 4/9/19. (GMP)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Meyer, Cassandra)
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for April 15, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 3, 2019 Filing 13 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for April 15, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order that Costco Wholesale Corporation show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/15/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order that Jennifer Wilson-Kinney show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/15/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Meyer, Cassandra)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Plaintiff by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Meyer, Cassandra) (MFR)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16606803. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1493-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (MFR)
March 4, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Compuslory Arbitration upon Costco Wholesale Corporation on 2/11/2019 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 2/11/2019.) (MFR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Meyer, Cassandra) (MFR)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-002508. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16606803 filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Meyer, Cassandra) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-E)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson-Kinney v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Wilson-Kinney
Represented By: Daniel Scott Brill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Represented By: Tyler Brandon Sankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?