Anderson v. Maricopa County Community College District et al

Plaintiff: Karen Russo Anderson
Defendant: Unknown Wise, Maricopa County Community College District and Maria Wise
Case Number: 2:2019cv01763
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/28/19. (MSA)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Maricopa County Community College District, Maria Wise, Unknown Wise.(Pate, Melanie)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Stipulation and Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines to File Case Management Report and Responsive Pleading, and to Continue Case Management Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference currently set for June 28, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting the Defendants a one-time extension to June 28, 2019 in which to respond to the Complaint. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/24/19. (CLB)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND RESPONSIVE PLEADING, AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Karen Russo Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Alden)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Scheduling Conference set for 6/28/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See document for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/11/19. (GMP)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Karen Russo Anderson: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 3/26/19 to Maricopa County Community College District and Maria Wise. *Modified to correct event on 3/27/2019 (GMP).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m) directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on June 17, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/19/2019. (REK)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Maricopa County Community College District, Maria Wise, Unknown Wise. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Karen Russo Anderson. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16660826. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1763-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Karen Russo Anderson. (Silence, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16660826 filed by Karen Russo Anderson. (Silence, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Maricopa County Community College District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wise
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Melanie V Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Community College District
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Melanie V Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Wise
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Melanie V Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Russo Anderson
Represented By: David N Farren
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silence
Represented By: Alden A Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?