Maghan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Marjorie Maghan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01768
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript re: #10 Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Transcript, #3 Administrative Pt 1, #4 Administrative Pt 2, #5 Administrative Pt 3, #6 Administrative Pt 4, #7 Payment, #8 Jurisdiction, #9 Non-Disability, #10 Disability, #11 Med Rec 1, #12 Med Rec 2, #13 Med Rec 3, #14 Med Rec 4, #15 Med Rec 5, #16 Med Rec 6, #17 Med Rec 7, #18 Med Rec 8)(Chen, Carolyn)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Chen, Carolyn)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carolyn Chen appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Chen, Carolyn)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Marjorie Maghan: re: Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General on 3/27/19. (Osterhout, Karl)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Marjorie Maghan: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon OGC on 3/25/19. (Osterhout, Karl)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Marjorie Maghan: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon U.S. Attorney on 3/27/19. (Osterhout, Karl)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/19/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
March 19, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Karl E Osterhout on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to US Attorney, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel-Region X, Atty General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16663767. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-01768-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Marjorie Maghan. (Osterhout, Karl) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16663767 filed by Marjorie Maghan. (Osterhout, Karl) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maghan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Carolyn Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Maghan
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?