Williamson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Dawn D Williamson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01803
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TRIAL. Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett added. Judge Diane J Humetewa no longer assigned to case. All further pleadings shall list the following case number: CV-19-1803-PHX-ESW. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/6/19. (MAP)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript re: #10 Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Transcript, #3 Administrative, #4 Payment, #5 Jurisdiction, #6 Non-Disability, #7 Disability, #8 Med Rec 1, #9 Med Rec 2)(Tomaselli, Gina)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Tomaselli, Gina)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gina Tomaselli appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Tomaselli, Gina)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Dawn D Williamson: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Matthew G Whitaker, Acting US Attorney General (04/01/19); Nancy A. Berryhill, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (04/01/19); Elizabeth Strange, First Assistant US Attorney for the District of Arizona (04/01/19) on 04/01/19; 04/01/19; 04/01/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic return receipts and certified mail receipts)(Caldwell, Mark)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/25/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/25/2019. (LFIG)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1803-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Dawn D Williamson. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Dawn D Williamson. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KEP)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dawn D Williamson. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn D Williamson
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Gina Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?