Watzka v. Progrexion Holdings Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Watzka
Defendant: Progrexion Holdings Incorporated and Progrexion Teleservices Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv01848
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER vacating the Order to Show cause hearing scheduled for Monday, 06/03/19, FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a status report on or before 09/03/19, regarding the status of substituting plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns on 6/3/19. (NKS)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE re: of Death of Plaintiff And Motion to Vacate Order to Show Cause Hearing by Teresa Watzka . (Bode, Timothy)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order that Teresa Watzka show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/3/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Progrexion Holdings Incorporated, Progrexion Teleservices Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16679206. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-01848-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAR)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Teresa Watzka. (Hertzog, Erin) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAR)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16679206 filed by Teresa Watzka. (Hertzog, Erin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watzka v. Progrexion Holdings Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progrexion Holdings Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progrexion Teleservices Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Watzka
Represented By: Erin A Hertzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?