Rouse v. CVS Pharmacy Incorporated

Plaintiff: Kevin Rouse
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv01978
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Transfer in the District of Minnesota. New Case Number: 0:19-cv-1224. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 6, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to the District of Minnesota, Third and Fourth Division by electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' Joint Stipulation to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota and Extend Answer Deadline (Doc. #12 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this entire action be transferred to District of Minnesota, Third and Fourth Division. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be twenty-one (21) days from the date that the District of Minnesota accepts transfer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's pending motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or alternative motion to transfer venue to the District of Minnesota (Doc. #9 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/6/2019. (SST)
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Transfer Venue and Extend Answer Deadline by CVS Pharmacy Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Allin, Taylor)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(b)(1) Pleadings and Other Paper. Please note for future filings; All pleadings must be signed as provided in FedRuleCiv 11(a). No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy Incorporated. (Allin, Taylor) *Modified record on 4/22/2019 (DXD).
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by CVS Pharmacy Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Part 2 of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas Moffatt)(Allin, Taylor)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Thomas J. Lyons Sr. by Kevin Rouse. (Lyons, Thomas) *Modified to correct event on 4/22/2019 (DXD).
April 16, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Thomas J Lyons Jr. on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kevin Rouse: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, MIDP Notice, MIDP Users' Manual Preliminary Order upon CVS Pharmacy, Inc. on 3/29/2019. (Mengedoth, Paul)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on June 25, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CVS Pharmacy Incorporated. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16699599. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1978-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Kevin Rouse. (Mengedoth, Paul) (MCO)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16699599 filed by Kevin Rouse. (Mengedoth, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rouse v. CVS Pharmacy Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Rouse
Represented By: Paul B Mengedoth
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Incorporated
Represented By: Taylor H Allin
Represented By: David S Almeida
Represented By: Mark S Eisen
Represented By: Brian Thomas DelGatto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?