Dragoo v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Walter Dragoo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01988
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript re: #10 Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Transcript, #3 Administrative, #4 Payment, #5 Jurisdiction, #6 Non-Disability, #7 Disability, #8 Med Rec 1, #9 Med Rec 2, #10 Med Rec 3, #11 Med Rec 4, #12 Med Rec 5, #13 Med Rec 6, #14 Med Rec 7, #15 Med Rec 8, #16 Med Rec 9, #17 Med Rec 10, #18 Med Rec 11, #19 Med Rec 12, #20 Med Rec 13, #21 Med Rec 14, #22 Med Rec 15, #23 Med Rec 16)(Clark, Carol)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Clark, Carol)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Carol Clark appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Attorney Ellinor R Coder terminated. . (Clark, Carol)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ellinor Coder appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Coder, Ellinor)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: See order for deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/27/2019. (LMR)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint and shall file proof of service no later than June 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/26/19. (MSA)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1988-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Walter Dragoo. (Dicus, Kathryn) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Walter Dragoo. (Dicus, Kathryn) (MCO)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Walter Dragoo. (Dicus, Kathryn) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dragoo v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Dragoo
Represented By: Kathryn Dicus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Ellinor R Coder
Represented By: Carol Sue Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?