Gibson v. CoreLogic Credco LLC

Plaintiff: Latoya Danielle Gibson
Defendant: CoreLogic Credco LLC and CoreLogic Rental Properties Solutions LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02090
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 8/23/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/9/2019. (TCA)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-2090-PHX-SMB. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for July 30, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order that CoreLogic Rental Properties Solutions LLC show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/30/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to CoreLogic Rental Properties Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CoreLogic Rental Properties Solutions LLC. (Hassett, Myles)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by CoreLogic Rental Properties Solutions LLC.(Hassett, Myles)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Latoya Danielle Gibson: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 04/22/2019 to CoreLogic Rental Property Solutions, LLC . (Bybee, Floyd)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 *AMENDED COMPLAINT against CoreLogic Rental Property Solutions LLC filed by Latoya Danielle Gibson.(Bybee, Floyd) *Modified to correct defendant's name on 4/23/2019 (EJA).
March 31, 2019 Filing 7 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CoreLogic Credco LLC. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16720553. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D. Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2090-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Latoya Danielle Gibson. (Bybee, Floyd) (KEP)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16720553 filed by Latoya Danielle Gibson. (Bybee, Floyd) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. CoreLogic Credco LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreLogic Credco LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreLogic Rental Properties Solutions LLC
Represented By: Jamie Alexander Glasser
Represented By: Myles Patrick Hassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Danielle Gibson
Represented By: Floyd W Bybee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?