Watson v. Capital One Bank USA NA et al

Plaintiff: Jerry Watson
Defendant: Capital One Bank USA NA, Experian Information Solutions Incorporated, Gurstel Law Firm PC, Equifax Information Services LLC and TransUnion LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02105
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Katherine A Neben on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jerry Watson. (Chami, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Javadizadeh, Sheereen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Hubbard, Maria)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/27/2020. Dispositive motions due by 5/25/2020. ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot the #39 , #40 Motions for Telephonic Appearance. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/21/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic Appearance at Rule 16 Conference by Capital One Bank USA NA, Gurstel Law Firm PC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear - Telephonic Appearance at Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Javadizadeh, Sheereen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 38 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Jerry Watson. (Chami, David)
June 13, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Findsen on behalf of Jerry Watson. (Findsen, Beth)
June 7, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA NA. (Parker, Andrew)
May 30, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant TransUnion LLC. (Masog, Miles)
May 30, 2019 Filing 34 *NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal filed by David Ali Chami terminating Tyler Holyfield. (Chami, David) *Modified to correct text on 5/31/2019 (GMP).
May 30, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Gurstel Law Firm PC. (Parker, Andrew)
May 22, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Javadizadeh, Sheereen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Hubbard, Maria)
May 21, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Sheereen Javadizadeh on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 20, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Jerry Watson. (Chami, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank USA NA identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank USA NA. (Parker, Andrew)
May 7, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TransUnion LLC.(Masog, Miles)
April 29, 2019 Filing 27 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Capital One Bank USA NA.(Ungar, Loren)
April 29, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE re: Notice of Service by Jerry Watson re: #10 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Chami, David)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER approving the #22 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time and providing Defendants Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. and Gurstel Law Firm, P.C. F/K/A Gurstel Chargo, P.A. an additional seven (7) days to respond to the complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendants' answer to the complaint after the extension. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/23/2019. (LFIG)
April 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Capital One Bank USA NA, #23 MOTION for Extension of Time Stipulated Motion To Extend Time To File Answer filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMV)
April 22, 2019 Filing 23 *Additional Attachments to Main Document - Proposed Order re: #22 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time To File Answer by Capital One Bank USA NA, Gurstel Law Firm PC. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Motion To Extend Time To File Answer)(Ungar, Loren) *Modified to correct event and add filer on 4/23/2019 (RMV). Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3). Attorney noticed on 4/23/2019 (RMV).
April 22, 2019 Filing 22 *Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Capital One Bank USA NA, Gurstel Law Firm PC. (Ungar, Loren) *Modified to correct event and add filer on 4/23/2019 (RMV). Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3). Attorney noticed on 4/23/2019 (RMV).
April 22, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Wagner, Emily)
April 22, 2019 Filing 20 Experian Information Solution, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated.(Wagner, Emily)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting the #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Trans Union will have until and including May 7, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant Trans Union's Answer to the complaint after the extension. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/22/2019. (LFIG)
April 19, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Hubbard, Maria)
April 19, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Hubbard, Maria)
April 18, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TransUnion LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trans Union LLC for TransUnion LLC. (Masog, Miles)
April 18, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by TransUnion LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)(Masog, Miles)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 6/25/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/5/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 *NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Fernanda Hubbard and Melissa S Ho on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. (Hubbard, Maria) *Modified to add attorney on 4/8/2019 (RMV).
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jerry Watson: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Cover Sheet, Notice of Judge Availability, Notice of MIDP, upon Experian Information Solutions Incorporated - Richard Perez - Corporate Security on 4/01/2019. (Chami, David) *Modified to clarify text on 4/8/2019 (RMV).
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jerry Watson: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Cover Sheet, Notice of Judge Availability, Notice of MIDP, upon TransUnion LLC - Patricia Gil - Legal Dept. on 4/2/2019. (Chami, David) *Modified to clarify text on 4/8/2019 (RMV).
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/1/2019. (LFIG)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jerry Watson: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Cover Sheet, Notice of Judge Availability, Notice of MIDP, upon Melody Creswell - Equifax Information Services, LLC. on 4/01/2019. (Chami, David)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jerry Watson: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Cover Sheet, Notice of Judge Availability, Notice of MIDP, upon Maria Martinez, CT Corporation System - Registered Agent on 4/01/2019. (Chami, David)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jerry Watson: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Cover Sheet, Notice of Judge Availability, Notice of MIDP, upon Kenya Bracey designated Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. on 4/01/2019. (Chami, David)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank USA NA, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Incorporated, Gurstel Law Firm PC, TransUnion LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Jerry Watson. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16721646. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2105-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Jerry Watson. (Chami, David) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(KEP)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16721646 filed by Jerry Watson. (Chami, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Capital One Bank USA NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Watson
Represented By: David Ali Chami
Represented By: Tyler Holyfield
Represented By: Beth Findsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank USA NA
Represented By: Shannon N Crane
Represented By: Brad J Clark
Represented By: Loren Robert Ungar
Represented By: Jesse Henson Walker
Represented By: Kerry A Markert
Represented By: Jesse Vassallo Lopez
Represented By: Andrew David Parker
Represented By: Dwayne D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Incorporated
Represented By: Katherine A Neben
Represented By: Sheereen Javadizadeh
Represented By: Emily Gildar Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurstel Law Firm PC
Represented By: Shannon N Crane
Represented By: Brad J Clark
Represented By: Loren Robert Ungar
Represented By: Jesse Henson Walker
Represented By: Kerry A Markert
Represented By: Jesse Vassallo Lopez
Represented By: Andrew David Parker
Represented By: Dwayne D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Maria Fernanda Hubbard
Represented By: Melissa S Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion LLC
Represented By: William W Drury, Jr.
Represented By: Miles Masog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?