Blood v. Pleasant Pediatrics PLC
Plaintiff: Michelle Blood
Defendant: Pleasant Pediatrics PLC, Sandhya Ravi and Prasad Ravi
Case Number: 2:2019cv02130
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #15 First MOTION to Dismiss Case FOR FAILURE TO JOIN AN INDISPENSABLE PARTY filed by Pleasant Pediatrics PLC, Prasad Ravi, Sandhya Ravi. (Uppal, Pavneet)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re: #16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 Amended Complaint filed by Pleasant Pediatrics PLC, Prasad Ravi, Sandhya Ravi. (Uppal, Pavneet)
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE re: Notice of Service by Michelle Blood re Doc 4 and Doc 7 to parties. (Wilkins, Amy)
June 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Amy Marie Wilkins. (Wilkins, Amy)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #15 First MOTION to Dismiss Case FOR FAILURE TO JOIN AN INDISPENSABLE PARTY filed by Michelle Blood. (Wilkins, Amy)
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 Amended Complaint by Michelle Blood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redlined amended pleading, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Wilkins, Amy) *Modified linkage on 5/29/2019 (DXD).
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Dismiss Case FOR FAILURE TO JOIN AN INDISPENSABLE PARTY by Pleasant Pediatrics PLC, Prasad Ravi, Sandhya Ravi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Uppal, Pavneet)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Stipulation #11 . Deadline for Defendants to respond toPlaintiffs First Amended Complaint is extended for ten days, up to and including Monday, May 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/6/2019. (TCA)
May 6, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Michelle Blood: Acceptance of Service re: Acceptance of Service Summons 1st Amended Complaint upon Deft Prasad Ravi on May 2, 2019. (Wilkins, Amy)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Michelle Blood: Acceptance of Service re: Summons 1st Amd Complaint upon Deft Dr. Sandhya Ravi on May 2, 2019. (Wilkins, Amy)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #10 Amended Complaint by Pleasant Pediatrics PLC, Prasad Ravi, Sandhya Ravi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Uppal, Pavneet)
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 *AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pleasant Pediatrics PLC, Prasad Ravi and Sandhya Ravi filed by Michelle Blood.(Wilkins, Amy) *Modified to add defendants on 4/25/2019 (EJA).
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Michelle Blood . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redlined First Amended Complaint)(Wilkins, Amy)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Michelle Blood: Declaration of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Pleasant Pediatrics on 4/11/2019. (Wilkins, Amy)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/1/2019. (TCA)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on June 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/1/2019. (TCA)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Pleasant Pediatrics PLC. (MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16725967. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2130-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Michelle Blood. (Wilkins, Amy) (MFR)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16725967 filed by Michelle Blood. (Wilkins, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blood v. Pleasant Pediatrics PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Blood
Represented By: Elliot Spencer Isaac
Represented By: Amy Marie Wilkins
Represented By: James Edward Doman, Jr.
Represented By: Adam Patterson Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasant Pediatrics PLC
Represented By: Lori Aysegul Guner
Represented By: Alanna Rebecca Brook
Represented By: Pavneet Singh Uppal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandhya Ravi
Represented By: Lori Aysegul Guner
Represented By: Alanna Rebecca Brook
Represented By: Pavneet Singh Uppal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prasad Ravi
Represented By: Lori Aysegul Guner
Represented By: Alanna Rebecca Brook
Represented By: Pavneet Singh Uppal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?