Koroma v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Tamara Koroma
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv02149
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting the #13 Motion to Withdraw and withdrawing Randal S. Forbes, of the law firm Forbes Rodman, as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/8/2019. (LFIG)
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document signed by attorney Randal S. Forbes but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Jason S. Rodman. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Randal s. Forbes by Tamara Koroma. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodman, Jason)
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - Forms of Papers. Please note for future filings; Attorney filing information must be typed in upper left corner. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying with leave to re-file the #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/30/2019. (LFIG)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney For Randal S. Forbes by Tamara Koroma. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodman, Jason)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BAS)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/2/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting the #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/2/2019. (LFIG)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Tamara Koroma. (Rodman, Jason)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Tamara Koroma. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please re-file the current, automated civil cover sheet to include the correct format. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-02149-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Tamara Koroma. (Rodman, Jason) (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Forms)(BAC)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tamara Koroma. (Rodman, Jason) (BAC)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tamara Koroma. (Rodman, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Attorney Appearance)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koroma v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Koroma
Represented By: Randal S Forbes
Represented By: Jason Scott Rodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?