Gallegos v. Penzone
Plaintiff: Amanda Marie Gallegos
Defendant: Paul Penzone, Mark Kiltredge and Unknown Party
Case Number: 2:2019cv02159
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine (PS)
Referring Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Amanda Marie Gallegos. Reason for return: No longer in Custody. Document number #9 , #10 . (MSA)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Amanda Marie Gallegos. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/24/19. (DXD)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Second Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $46.86. The Amended Complaint (Doc. #8 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim with 30 days leave to file a second amended complaint. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/24/19. (DXD)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paul Penzone, Unknown Party, Mark Kiltredge filed by Amanda Marie Gallegos (7 pages).(DXD)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Amanda Marie Gallegos (3 pages). (DXD)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Amanda Marie Gallegos (3 pages). (DXD)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Application Form) (DXD)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DXD)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Amanda Marie Gallegos (2 pages). (DXD)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Amanda Marie Gallegos (3 pages). (DXD)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Amanda Marie Gallegos (7 pages). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallegos v. Penzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Marie Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Penzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kiltredge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?