Midland National Life Insurance Company v. Niewenhous et al
Plaintiff: Midland National Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Kelly Cullum, Gus Niewenhous and Unknown Party
Case Number: 2:2019cv02214
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: the Motion for Extension of Time #14 is granted. PlaintiTf shall have until September 3, 2019 to accomplish and file proof of service on Defendants. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/2/2019. (LMR)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Memorandum of Law #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Service by Plaintiff Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Strickland, Gary)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Service by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Strickland, Gary)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Midland National Life Insurance Company: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 06/19/2019 to Kelly Cullum . (Strickland, Gary)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Midland National Life Insurance Company: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 06/19/2019 to Gus Nilewenhous . (Strickland, Gary)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 and #10 NOTICE re: Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service. Incorrect PDF attached. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct Waiver of Service of Summons Form provided. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. (DXD)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 *NOTICE re: Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service as to Kelly Cullum filed by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Strickland, Gary) *Modified to correct event on 6/19/2019 (DXD).
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 *NOTICE re: Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service as to Gus Nilewenhous filed by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Strickland, Gary) *Modified to correct event on 6/19/2019 (DXD).
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than July 3, 2019. Plaintiff(s) must serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on July 3, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Midland National Life Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kelly Cullum, Gus Niewenhous. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16748641. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-02214-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Strickland, Gary) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (BAC)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16748641 filed by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Strickland, Gary) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midland National Life Insurance Company v. Niewenhous et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Cullum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gus Niewenhous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midland National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary Brian Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?