Rosario v. RealPage Incorporated

Plaintiff: Jonathan Santiago Rosario
Defendant: RealPage Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02220
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine for purposes of settlement conference. The parties shall jointly call Magistrate Judge Fines chambers on or before July 19, 2019 to schedule the settlement conference.Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/12/2019. (TCA)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 3/20/2020. Dispositive motions due by 6/19/2020. Telephone Trial Conference set for 7/8/2020 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Scheduling conference set for 7/19/2019 is vacated. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/12/2019. (TCA)
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Santiago Rosario. (Gorski, Gregory)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Santiago Rosario. (Gorski, Gregory)
June 20, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Ronald I Raether Jr on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 14, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for David M Gettings on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 7/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/4/2019. (TCA)
June 3, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by RealPage Incorporated.(Newell, Joel)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/15/2019. (TCA)
May 15, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-2220-PHX-SMB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Joel Frederic Newell. (Newell, Joel)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time to respond to complaint by 30 days. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the 30-day extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 5/03/2019. (REK)
May 2, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Gregory Gorski on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to RealPage Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 *Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint by RealPage Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newell, Joel) *Modified to correct motion type on 5/2/2019 (REK).
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RealPage Incorporated. (Newell, Joel)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Frederic Newell on behalf of RealPage Incorporated. (Newell, Joel)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to RealPage Incorporated. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16750268. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2220-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Jonathan Santiago Rosario. (Mengedoth, Paul)(MCO)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16750268 filed by Jonathan Santiago Rosario. (Mengedoth, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosario v. RealPage Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Santiago Rosario
Represented By: Paul B Mengedoth
Represented By: Gregory J Gorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RealPage Incorporated
Represented By: David Michael Gettings
Represented By: Ronald I Raether, Jr
Represented By: Joel Frederic Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?