Kelly v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kimberlee Lyn Kelly
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02431
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 7/3/2020. Dispositive motions due by 8/7/2020. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/25/2019. (LMR)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 *AMENDED DOCUMENT Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) by USAA Casualty Insurance Company . (Ronan, Kristyn) *Modified text on 6/26/2019 (REK).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: No later than June 25, 2019, the parties shall complete the form entitled Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction and deliver the document in person or by mail to the Clerk's Office. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/11/2019. (LMR)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Rule 16 Case Management Conference, presently set for June 21, 2019 before Honorable Steven P. Logan, is vacated. Order to follow. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/11/2019. (LMR)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Kimberlee Lyn Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Rule 16 Case Management Order)(Harrison, Steven)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 *NOTICE re: Service of #5 Preliminary Order by Kimberlee Lyn Kelly . (Harrison, Steven) *Modified to add document link on 5/24/2019 (REK).
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Kimberlee Lyn Kelly. (Harrison, Steven)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Ronan, Kristyn)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 6/21/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(LMR)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Meyer, Nathan)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY ORDER: A motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16789310.. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2431-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
April 15, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Notice of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon USAA Casualty Insurance Company on 3/21/2019. (Original filed in Maricopa Superior Court on 3/26/2019). (DLC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Ronan, Kristyn) (DLC)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-091120. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16789310 filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Ronan, Kristyn) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberlee Lyn Kelly
Represented By: Steven E Harrison
Represented By: M Brent Peugnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan David Meyer
Represented By: Kristyn Michelle Ronan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?